EP0276309 - PROCESS FOR SEPARATION OF HIGH PURITY GAS FROM MIXED GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | For all designated states SEITETSU KAGAKU CO. LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harimacho, Kako-gun Hyogo 675-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | |||
For all designated states SEITETSU KAGAKU CO. LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harimacho, Kako-gun Hyogo 675-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANO, Matsuki 1-35, Kitano-cho Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 02 /
AONO, Tadayoshi 8-29, Nisiyumesakidai Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 03 /
KURIMOTO, Makoto 6-427, Ikku-cho 2-chome Niihama-shi Ehime 792 / JP | 04 /
UNO, Masaru 849-1, Nishifutami Futami-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674 / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Rudolf Am Winternocken 12 42555 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Stahl, Rudolf Am Winternocken 12 D-42555 Velbert / DE | Application number, filing date | 86905417.1 | 11.09.1986 | [1988/31] | WO1986JP00465 | Priority number, date | JP19850200900 | 11.09.1985 Original published format: JP 20090085 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701611 | Date: | 26.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276309 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, C01B31/20 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
C01B32/50 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/116 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2256/22 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7025 (EP,US);
B01D2259/403 (EP,US);
Y02C20/20 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON HOCHREINEM GAS AUS GASMISCHUNGEN | [1988/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR SEPARATION OF HIGH PURITY GAS FROM MIXED GAS | [1988/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'UN GAZ DE PURETE ELEVEE DANS UN MELANGE DE GAZ | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 28.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/24] | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.1988 | 01.10.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE146646 [ ]; | DE103070 [ ]; | DE1444447 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | DE3150690 [ ] (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) |