EP0235257 - MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL PACKET TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/37] | MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL PACKET TELEPHONE SYSTEM | ||
[1993/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPUBLIC TELCOM SYSTEMS CORP. 6150 Lookout Road Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [1987/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLLUB, Raphael 301 Shellard Parkway Apt. 348 St. Louis Park, MN 55426 / US | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86905539.2 | 20.08.1986 | [1987/37] | WO1986US01721 | Priority number, date | US19850769153 | 23.08.1985 Original published format: US 769153 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701254 | Date: | 26.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235257 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235257 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/24, H04J15/00, H04B1/66 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
H04J3/1688 (EP,US);
H04J3/24 (KR);
H04J3/0632 (EP,US);
H04L12/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | DIGITALES PAKET-FERNSPRECHÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN MIT MULTIPLEXBETRIEB | [1993/24] | English: | MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL PACKET TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION METHOD | [1993/24] | French: | METHODE DE COMMUNICATION TELEPHONIQUE PAR PAQUETS NUMERIQUES MULTIPLEXES | [1993/24] |
Former [1987/37] | DIGITALES PAKET-FERNSPRECHSYSTEM MIT MULTIPLEXBETRIEB | ||
Former [1987/37] | MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL PACKET TELEPHONE SYSTEM | ||
Former [1987/37] | SYSTEME TELEPHONIQUE PAR PAQUETS NUMERIQUES MULTIPLEXES | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1987 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1991 | 31.08.1992 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.06.1993 | NL | 16.06.1993 | SE | 16.06.1993 | CH | 31.08.1993 | LI | 31.08.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.06.1993 | |
NL | 16.06.1993 | ||
SE | 16.06.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | NL | 16.06.1993 | |
SE | 16.06.1993 | ||
CH | 31.08.1993 | ||
LI | 31.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | NL | 16.06.1993 | |
SE | 16.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 16.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4453247 (SUZUKI MICHIO [JP], et al) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SEMINAR ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, 12th-15th March 1974, Zurich, pages B7(1)-B7(3), IEEE, New York, US; M. TSCHANZ: "The exploitation of statistical properties of speech signals for address-coded transmission" | [A] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, 7th-11th May 1979, Paris, pages 757-764; Y. IKEDA et al.: "Virtual circuit switching system: a new system concept for telephony and data integration" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-32, no. 4, April 1984, pages 403-410, IEEE, New York, US; N.-M. KIM et al.: "A multisubscriber variable-rate sampling HCDM system with dynamic buffer control" | International search | [A]US4383316 (SEIDEL HAROLD); | [A]US4503510 (WEAVER CHARLES S [US]); | [A]US4512013 (NASH RANDY D [US], et al); | [AP]US4589110 (ENG KAI Y [US], et al) |