EP0238538 - AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR AND AN ELECTRICAL TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) 470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608 Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGLA, Juan C/Alfonso Sala, 33 Sant Cugat Del Valles Barcelona / ES | 02 /
LAZARO, Jose C/Eliximenis 85 Fntld. Esc C Barcelona / ES | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1989/27] | Warren, Francis Charles Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1987/40] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86905552.5 | 22.08.1986 | [1987/40] | WO1986US01735 | Priority number, date | GB19850024065 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8524065 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702194 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238538 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238538 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H02K5/22 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H01R4/2445 (EP,US);
H01R4/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER UND ELEKTRISCHE ANSCHLUSSKLEMME | [1987/40] | English: | AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR AND AN ELECTRICAL TERMINAL | [1987/40] | French: | CONNECTEUR ET BORNE ELECTRIQUES | [1987/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1987 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/40] | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB238670 [ ] (LOUIS JOHN SIMON); | US3675320 [ ] (WATANABE TAKASHI); | US3852702 [ ] (DOWLING E); | FR2300431 [ ] (AMP INC [US]); | FR2376532 [ ] (PRONER SA ETS [FR]); | GB2109177 [ ] (ALMA ETS LTD) |