EP0236446 - MASS TRANSFER EXTRACTION OF LIQUIDS FROM SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITAMINS, INC. 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago IL 60601-7799 / US | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICE, Wayne, K. 121 Sprunger Drive Wanatah, IN 46390 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86905630.9 | 05.09.1986 | [1987/38] | WO1986US01839 | Priority number, date | US19850774332 | 10.09.1985 Original published format: US 774332 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701381 | Date: | 12.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236446 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236446 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09F5/02, C11B1/06 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
B01D11/0203 (EP,US);
C09F5/02 (KR);
B30B9/12 (EP,US);
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
C11B1/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSEXTRAKTION AUS FESTSTOFFEN MITTELS MASSENÜBERTRAGUNG | [1987/38] | English: | MASS TRANSFER EXTRACTION OF LIQUIDS FROM SOLIDS | [1987/38] | French: | EXTRACTION DE LIQUIDES A PARTIR DE SOLIDES PAR TRANSFERT DE MASSE | [1987/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1987 | Search fee paid | 30.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1535769 (JOACHIM GALLARDO JOSEPH); | [X]FR1206381 (NORMANDE DE MATIERES PLASTIQUE); | [X]US3005398 (SANDLER ROBERT A); | [X]DE1164298 (WASAGCHEMIE AG); | [X]FR1358790 (CIBA GEIGY); | [A]DE2142205 (HAG AG); | [X]FR2298279 (CERES ECOLOGY CORP [US]); | [X]DE3118272 (PLUTA WERNER DR); | [A]US4443321 (COMPTON LESLIE E [US]) | International search | [X]US2762510 (GWYN JR HARRY M, et al); | [X]US4058410 (DIETZEL WALTER, et al); | [X]US4466923 (FRIEDRICH JOHN P [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS 100: 105629y, page 125, GAEHRS et al, Chem-Tech, 12(11), 1983, pp. 59-61 | [X] - Chemical Engineers' Handbook, 5th Edition, (1972), pp. 19-19, 19-20, 19-43, 19-101-19-106, PERRY et al |