EP0238558 - SPECIMEN COOLING AND WARMING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEILBY, John Andrew 1 Berkeley Avenue Nollamara, W.A. 6061 / AU | For all designated states ATTIKIOUZEL, Yianni 53 Hesperia Avenue City Beach, W.A. 6015 / AU | [1987/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/40] | Application number, filing date | 86905677.0 | 26.09.1986 | [1987/40] | WO1986AU00278 | Priority number, date | AU19850002620 | 26.09.1985 Original published format: AU 262085 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702122 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238558 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/10, B01L7/00 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
B01L7/54 (EP);
A01N1/02 (EP);
A01N1/0252 (EP);
A01N1/0284 (EP);
B01L7/00 (EP);
F25D3/10 (EP);
G01N1/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HEIZEN UND KÜHLEN | [1987/40] | English: | SPECIMEN COOLING AND WARMING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1987/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECHAUFFAGE ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'EPROUVETTES | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 26.06.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU1287483 ; | [X]US3891477 ; | [X]US3916640 ; | [X]US3494140 ; | [X]US3613386 ; | [A]US3080725 ; | [A]US3092974 ; | [A]US4306425 ; | [A]AU2303484 |