EP0238673 - VERTICAL STORAGE APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Go, Junichi 2510-11, Nagara Gifu-shi Gifu-ken 502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Go, Junichi 2510-11, Nagara Gifu-shi, Gifu-ken 502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Orr, William McLean, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86905932.9 | 04.10.1986 | [1987/40] | WO1986JP00509 | Priority number, date | JP19850002245 | 08.10.1985 Original published format: JP 224585 | JP19860105653 | 08.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10565386 | JP19860105654 | 08.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10565486 | JP19860109005 | 13.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10900586 | JP19860109006 | 13.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10900686 | JP19860115675 | 20.05.1986 Original published format: JP 11567586 | JP19860126303 | 30.05.1986 Original published format: JP 12630386 | JP19860134549 | 10.06.1986 Original published format: JP 13454986 | JP19860216684 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21668486 | [1987/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702405 | Date: | 23.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238673 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238673 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.04.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/18, E04H6/24 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
E04H6/287 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/40] | Title | German: | SENKRECHTE LAGERVORRICHTUNG UND REGELUNGSVERFAHREN DAZU | [1987/40] | English: | VERTICAL STORAGE APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [1987/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE STOCKAGE VERTICAL ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [1987/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/14: Teilanmeldung 89111115.5 eingereicht am 04/10/86 | EPB 1991/14: Divisional application 89111115.5 filed on 04/10/86 | EPB 1991/14: Demande divisionnaire 89111115.5 déposée le 04/10/86 | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1987 | Translation filed | 16.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1987 | Search fee paid | 16.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/40] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89111115.5 / EP0337514 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2923421 (DE ROUMEFORT FRANCOIS DE SENIG); | [X]FR1245500 (MOTOPARKS LTD) | International search | [Y]JPS4862180 ; | [Y]JPS4872877 ; | [Y]JPS4423696B ; | [Y]JPS4980774 ; | [Y]US3675799 (STEED FRANK STREEION); | [A]US3618793 (COURSEY RALPH W); | [A]US3896955 (COLLINS EARL R, et al); | [A]JPS4712677U |