EP0245305 - COPPER OXIDE TREATMENT IN PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTHONE, INCORPORATED 350 Frontage Road West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [1990/20] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states ENTHONE, INCORPORATED 350 Frontage Road West Haven, CT 06516 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAJDU, Juan 373 Old Silo Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | 02 /
BAYES, Martin, W. 44 Overlook Road Ossining, NY 10562 / US | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1987/47] | Application number, filing date | 86906162.2 | 24.09.1986 | [1987/47] | WO1986US02007 | Priority number, date | US19850790999 | 24.10.1985 Original published format: US 790999 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702856 | Date: | 07.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245305 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/09, H05K3/22, C23F11/00, C23F11/08 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
C23C22/63 (EP,US);
H05K1/09 (KR);
H05K3/385 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0315 (EP,US);
H05K3/4611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | KUPFEROXYDENBEHANDLUNG IN GEDRUCKTEN SCHALTUNGEN | [1987/47] | English: | COPPER OXIDE TREATMENT IN PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [1987/47] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'OXYDE DE CUIVRE DANS UNE CARTE A CIRCUITS IMPRIMES | [1987/47] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1987 | Search fee paid | 18.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 30.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/40] | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1515361 (ELECTROFOILS LTD) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 20, no. 4, September 1977, page 1326, New YorkUS; L.N. CHELLIS et al.: "Preventing etchback around holes in printed-circuit boards" | International search | [Y]US1327400 (MERRIMAN THURSTON C); | [Y]US1327401 (MERRIMAN THURSTON C); | [Y]US1672180 (WALTER SMITH); | [Y]US2398202 (ZUBLIN ERNEST W, et al); | [Y]US2878149 (MASON WALTER A); | [Y]US2933422 (MASON WALTER A); | [Y]US2990300 (ERNEST PASKELL); | [Y]US3087778 (NEGRA JOHN S, et al); | [Y]US3464855 (SHAHEEN JOSEPH M, et al); | [Y]US3546775 (LALMOND HAROLD, et al); | [Y]US3677828 (CAULE ELMER J); | [Y]US3833433 (CAULE E); | [Y]US3900348 (ZUKRIEGEL HANS, et al); | [Y]US4121949 (WALTERS CHARLES W); | [Y]US4144118 (STAHL FRITZ); | [Y]US4190474 (BERDAN BETTY L [US], et al) |