EP0244444 - MAGNETIC-POLYMER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMMUNICON CORPORATION 1310 Masons Mill Business Campus 1800 Byberry Road, Bryn Athyn Huntington Valley, PA 19006 / US | [1987/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWEN, Charles, S. 512 Harvard Avenue Swarthmore, PA 19081 / US | 02 /
SILVIA, John, C. 702 Pine Lake Village Lindenwold, NJ 08021 / US | 03 /
D'ANGELO, Louis 35 Washburne Avenue Berlin, NJ 08009 / US | 04 /
LIBERTI, Paul, A. 58 Green Drive Churchville, PA 18966 / US | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86906210.9 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/46] | WO1986US02093 | Priority number, date | US19850784863 | 04.10.1985 Original published format: US 784863 | US19860906521 | 16.09.1986 Original published format: US 906521 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702063 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244444 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244444 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/50, C12N11/14 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
A61K49/1818 (EP,US);
A61K9/5094 (EP,US);
C12N11/14 (EP,US);
G01N33/54333 (EP,US);
G01N33/5434 (EP,US);
G01N2333/765 (EP,US);
G01N2446/20 (EP,US);
G01N2446/30 (EP,US);
Y10S435/972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1987/46] | C12Q1/00, C07K7/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/21] |
Former [1987/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE POLYMERTEILCHEN | [1987/46] | English: | MAGNETIC-POLYMER PARTICLES | [1987/46] | French: | PARTICULES MAGNETIQUES-POLYMERES | [1987/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/05: Teilanmeldung 92114989.4 eingereicht am 03/10/86 | EPB 1994/05: Divisional application 92114989.4 filed on 03/10/86 | EPB 1994/05: Demande divisionnaire 92114989.4 déposée le 03/10/86 | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1987 | Search fee paid | 03.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92114989.4 / EP0516198 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.10.1994 | LI | 31.10.1994 | [1995/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4169804 (YAPEL ANTHONY F JR [US]); | [X]EP0016552 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]); | [X]US4247406 (WIDDER KENNETH J, et al); | [XP]EP0184710 (BAYER AG [DE]) | International search | [X]US4001288 (GABLE HOWARD S, et al); | [Y]US4452773 (MOLDAY ROBERT S [CA]); | [YP]US4554088 (WHITEHEAD ROY A [US], et al); | [YP]US4582622 (IKEDA MIKIO [JP], et al) |