EP0246251 - INSTALLATION FOR PROVIDING A FILTERED AND STABILIZED MAINS VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/48] | INSTALLATION FOR PROVIDING A FILTERED AND STABILIZED NETWORK VOLTAGE | ||
[1990/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHO, Reinhard Lärchenstrasse 9 CH-5024 Küttigen / CH | [1987/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/48] | Application number, filing date | 86906261.2 | 19.11.1986 | [1987/48] | WO1986CH00159 | Priority number, date | CH19850004982 | 23.11.1985 Original published format: CH 498285 | [1987/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703392 | Date: | 04.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0246251 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246251 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/04, H02H9/00, H02J3/01 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
G05F3/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/48] | G05F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER GEFILTERTEN UND STABILISIERTEN NETZSPANNUNG | [1987/48] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR PROVIDING A FILTERED AND STABILIZED MAINS VOLTAGE | [1990/01] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE TENSION DE RESEAU FILTREE ET STABILISEE | [1987/48] |
Former [1987/48] | INSTALLATION FOR PROVIDING A FILTERED AND STABILIZED NETWORK VOLTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.01.1990 | IT | 03.01.1990 | NL | 03.01.1990 | SE | 03.01.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1990/43] | GB | 03.01.1990 | |
NL | 03.01.1990 | ||
SE | 03.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 03.01.1990 | |
SE | 03.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/34] | SE | 03.01.1990 | Cited in | International search | US3153187 [ ] |