EP0245320 - FIBRE, FILAMENT, YARN AND/OR SURFACE FORMATIONS CONTAINING ANY OF THESE AND/OR DEBRIS MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANY OF THESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHES TEXTILFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM NORD-WEST E.V. Frankenring 2 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1987/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSMANN, Adelgund Gahlingspfad 64a D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
SCHOLLMEYER, Eckhard Von-Baeyer-Str. 22 D-4152 Kempen 1 / DE | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Döring, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Mörikestrasse 18 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Döring, Wolfgang, Dr. Ing. Mörikestrasse 18 D-40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86906288.5 | 06.11.1986 | [1987/47] | WO1986DE00450 | Priority number, date | DE19853540411 | 14.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3540411 | DE19863630769 | 10.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3630769 | DE19863636395 | 25.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3636395 | [1987/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703021 | Date: | 21.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245320 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245320 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06M10/00 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
B29C59/16 (EP,US);
D06M10/00 (KR);
D02G3/402 (EP,US);
D06M10/005 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
B29K2313/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2976 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2978 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | FASER, FILAMENT, GARN UND/ODER DIESE BZW. DIESES AUFWEISENDE FLÄCHENGEBILDE UND/ODER HAUFWERK SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN BZW. DESSELBEN | [1987/47] | English: | FIBRE, FILAMENT, YARN AND/OR SURFACE FORMATIONS CONTAINING ANY OF THESE AND/OR DEBRIS MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANY OF THESE | [1987/47] | French: | FIBRES, FILAMENTS, FILS ET/OU FORMATIONS DE SURFACE LES CONTENANT ET/OU STRUCTURE FORMEE DE DEBRIS ET PROCEDE POUR LEUR PRODUCTION | [1987/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 21.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP50069310 ; | [A]GB2053789 (CA MINISTER NAT DEFENCE); | [X]EP0117561 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [XP]EP0173925 (BERGMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | [X] - Japanese Patent Gazette, part I, Chemical, week X03, 25 February 1976, Derwent Publications, Rochdale House (London, GB) see section F, page 3, & JP, A, 50069310 (Asahi Chemical Ind.) 10 June 1975, & JP50069310 A 19750610 | [X] - Textile Research Journal, Volume 44, No. 2, February 1974 (Princetown, New Jersey, US) S.B. NORDIN et al.: "An indication of Molten Cellulose Produced in a Laser Beam", pages 152-154, see the whole document |