EP0250465 - CONTINUOUS VAPOR DEPOSITION METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATED GLASS ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBBEY-OWENS-FORD CO. 811 Madison Avenue Toledo, OH 43695 / US | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLIES, Gerald A. 2728 Oxbridge Drive Toledo, OH 43614 / US | 02 /
ALBACH, Eberhard R. 4223 Shade Tree Drive Toledo, OH 43615 / US | 03 /
CONOUR, John F. 909 Phillips Maumee, OH 43537 / US | 04 /
HERRINGTON, Richard A. 300 Meadow Lane Walbridge, OH 43465 / US | [1990/01] |
Former [1988/01] | 01 /
CALLIES, Gerald, A. 2728 Oxbridge Drive Toledo, OH 43614 / US | ||
02 /
ALBACH, Eberhard, R. 4223 Shade Tree Drive Toledo, OH 43615 / US | |||
03 /
CONOUR, John, F. 909 Phillips Maumee, OH 43537 / US | |||
04 /
HERRINGTON, Richard, A. 300 Meadow Lane Walbridge, OH 43465 / US | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey LEWIS W. GOOLD & CO. Whitehall Chambers 23, Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906536.7 | 06.10.1986 | [1988/01] | WO1986US02055 | Priority number, date | US19850784976 | 07.10.1985 Original published format: US 784976 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701970 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250465 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250465 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B05D1/36, B05D3/02, B05D3/04, B05D5/00, B05D5/06, C03C17/00, C03C25/02, C23C16/24, C23C16/40, B32B9/00 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C03C17/3482 (EP,US);
B05D1/02 (KR);
C23C16/0218 (EP,US);
C23C16/407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES DAMPFNIEDERSCHLAGVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTETEN GLASGEGENSTANDES | [1988/01] | English: | CONTINUOUS VAPOR DEPOSITION METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATED GLASS ARTICLE | [1988/01] | French: | PROCEDE CONTINU DE METALLISATION SOUS VIDE POUR ENROBER UN ARTICLE DE VERRE | [1988/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1987 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 01.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60191034 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 20, May 1986, page 286, abstract no. 173123m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 191 034 (NEC CORP.) 28-09-1985, & JP60191034 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]US3374141 (JUNGE ALBERT E, et al); | [A]US3378396 (SOLOMON ZAROMB); | [A]US4019887 (KIRKBRIDE BERNARD JAMES, et al); | [Y]US4100330 (DONLEY HAROLD E); | [A]US4187336 (GORDON ROY G [US]); | [Y]US4188444 (LANDAU MANFRED [GB]); | [Y]US4188452 (GROTH ROLF [DE]); | [A]US4206252 (GORDON ROY G [US]); | [A]US4230773 (BAKOS PETER); | [A]US4259371 (POSTUPACK DENNIS S, et al); | [A]US4397671 (VONG SANDY T S [US]); | [A]US4431692 (HOFMANN WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US4492722 (RITTER II GEORGE W [US], et al); | [A]US4598023 (VAN LAETHEM ROBERT [BE], et al) |