EP0239634 - MULTIZONE PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAXPY COMPUTER CORPORATION 255 San Geronimo Way Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [1987/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICELY, Mark 116 A East Middlefield Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
SCHREIBER, Robert 2514 Rumond Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
PARKS, Terrance 156 Jacinto Way Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
MANNION, Joel 1121 Orchard Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 05 /
LANG, Gary 13172 Montrose Street Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 06 /
PATTON, Charles 31 Jacklin Circle Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/41] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86906558.1 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/41] | WO1986US02100 | Priority number, date | US19850784922 | 04.10.1985 Original published format: US 784922 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702156 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239634 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/06 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
G06F15/8007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/41] | Title | German: | MEHRZONALER PROZESSOR | [1987/41] | English: | MULTIZONE PROCESSOR | [1987/41] | French: | PROCESSEUR A ZONES MULTIPLES | [1987/41] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 03.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 26.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO8000758 [ ] (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | US4310879 [ ] (PANDEYA ARUN K) | [ ] - Computer Design, Vol. 20, No. 12, December 1981 (Winchester, Massachussets, USA), P. ALEXANDER, "Array Processor Design Concepts", pages 163-172, see column 3, line 27 - column 8line 15; figures 1-6 | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Computers, Vol. C-30, No. 12, December 1981 (IEEE, New York, USA), H.J. SIEGEL et al., "PASM: a Partitionable SIMD/MIMD System for Image Processing and Pattern Recognition", pages 934-947, see column 5lines 15-20; paragraph IVC; figure 2 | [ ] - Datamation, Vol. 16, No. 4, April 1970, (Barrington, Illinois, USA), D.E. McINTYRE, "An Introduction to the Illiac IV Computer ", pages 60-67, see column 3, line 8 - column 7line 13; paragraph "Programming Illiac IV; figures 2,3,6,8-10 |