EP0282483 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL AND DOSING SYSTEM FOR DESALINATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1992 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAUTICAL SERVICES PTY. LTD. 329 Preston Road Wynnum West, QLD 4178 / AU | [1988/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLOYD, Ian 329 Preston Road Wynnum West, QLD 4178 / AU | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906726.4 | 21.11.1986 | [1988/38] | WO1986AU00352 | Priority number, date | AU19850003506 | 21.11.1985 Original published format: AU 350685 | AU19850003611 | 27.11.1985 Original published format: AU 361185 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703275 | Date: | 04.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282483 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.06.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/04, B63J1/00, C02F5/08 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
B01D1/0082 (EP,US);
B01D1/305 (EP,US);
C02F1/042 (EP,US);
C02F1/686 (EP,US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US);
Y10S203/18 (EP,US);
Y10S203/19 (EP,US);
Y10T137/034 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7287 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7306 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] |
Former [1988/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES REGELUNGS- UND DOSIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ENTSALZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1988/38] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL AND DOSING SYSTEM FOR DESALINATORS | [1988/38] | French: | SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE DE COMMANDE ET DE DOSAGE POUR APPAREILS DE DESSALEMENT | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1988 | Search fee paid | 10.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/21] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1988 | 30.11.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1990 | 02.12.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1323684 (BABCOCK & WILCOX LTD) | International search | [Y]AU4606968B ; | [Y]AU2772567B ; | [Y]AU4151364B ; | [Y]FR2174677 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]GB734755 (G & J WEIR LTD, et al); | [Y]GB767927 (GEIGY CO LTD); | [Y]GB1381113 (EATON WILLIAMS RAYMOND H); | [Y]GB2101578 (FMC CORP [US], et al); | [Y]JPS59109284 (TOSHIBA KK, et al); | [Y]US1953491 (MARIUS SAINTE-MARTINE); | [Y]US2649408 (WILLIAMSON WILLIAM R, et al); | [Y]US3135670 (RISTAINO ANTONIO J, et al); | [Y]US3219555 (MOORE POINDEXTER ALLAN, et al); | [Y]US3397149 (GRUBER ALVIN V); | [Y]US3507754 (CRISTIANO FRANK JR, et al); | [Y]US3944785 (EATON-WILLIAMS RAYMOND H); | [Y]US3969193 (SAKUMA JUNICHI, et al) |