EP0286636 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DRYING AND/OR BURNING POWDERY MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RODDEWIG, Dieter Am Butterberg 35 D-3360 Osterode am Harz / DE | [1988/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Becker, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1990/09] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1988/42] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86906790.0 | 03.12.1986 | [1988/42] | WO1986DE00495 | Priority number, date | DE19853542904 | 04.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3542904 | [1988/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703508 | Date: | 18.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286636 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286636 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/40, F26B3/08, F26B7/00, C04B11/036, C04B11/26 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
B01J8/40 (EP,US);
C04B11/036 (EP,US);
F26B3/0923 (EP,US);
F27B5/00 (EP,US);
F27B9/2453 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B11/036, C04B11/0283, C04B11/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKEN UND/ODER BRENNEN PULVERFÖRMIGER STOFFE | [1988/42] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DRYING AND/OR BURNING POWDERY MATERIALS | [1988/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SECHAGE ET/OU DE CALCINATION DE MATIERES PULVERULENTES | [1988/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 29.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1990
23.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE Rigips GmbH Rühler Strasse D-37619 Bodenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Rücker, Wolfgang Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1990
23.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE Rigips GmbH Rühler Strasse D-37619 Bodenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | 12.02.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.06.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.01.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.02.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.04.1990 | SE | 18.04.1990 | [1997/17] |
Former [1991/17] | NL | 18.04.1990 | |
SE | 18.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 18.04.1990 | Cited in | International search | DE273025 [ ]; | GB392780 [ ] (GYPSUM LIME AND ALABASTINE CAN); | FR939805 [ ] (ICI LTD); | US3063848 [ ] (GELDER ARTHUR VAN); | FR2372655 [ ] (NIRO ATOMIZER AS [DK]); | US4112836 [ ] (WITTE JOHAN FREDERIK); | GB2026668 [ ] (HAMBRO MACHINERY LTD); | DE3337770 [ ] (HEINEN MASCHF GMBH [DE]) |