EP0229622 - Process for the preparation of 2-oxo-1,3-dioxolanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brindöpke, Gerhard, Dr. Loreleistrasse 18 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | [1987/30] | Application number, filing date | 87100074.1 | 07.01.1987 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | DE19863600602 | 11.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3600602 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229622 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229622 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229622 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/36, C08G71/00 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
C07D317/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/1405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Oxo-1,3-dioxolanen | [1987/30] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-oxo-1,3-dioxolanes | [1987/30] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 2-oxo-1,3-dioxolanes | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2611087 (ANIC SPA); | [A]WO8403701 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]); | [A]US4663467 (KRUPER JR WILLIAM J [US], et al) |