EP0230882 - Method for heat-treatment of a strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, 1-chome, Kitahonmachidori Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-651 / JP | |||
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, 1-chome, Kitahonmachidori Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-651 / JP | |||
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-Chome Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazumasa, Mihara Hiroshima Tech.Inst.of Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK 6-22, Kan-on-shinmachi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Fukushima, Takeo Hiroshima Shipyard & Eng.Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK 6-22, Kan-on-shinmachi 4-cho Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Sachihiro, Iida c/o Kawasaki Steel Corporation Hibiya Kokusai Bldg. 2-3, Ushisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shiraishi, Norihisa c/o Mizushima Works of Kawasaki Steel Corporation Mizushima-Kawasaki-dori 1-chome Kurashiki-shi Okayama-ken / JP | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100196.2 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860001306 | 09.01.1986 Original published format: JP 130686 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230882 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230882 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/56, C21D9/573 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C21D9/563 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (KR);
C21D9/5737 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wärmebehandlung von Bandstahl | [1987/32] | English: | Method for heat-treatment of a strip | [1987/32] | French: | Procédé de traitement thermique d'un feuillard | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP5896824 ; | [A]JP5913031 ; | [A]JP6021333 ; | [A]DE3324548 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0117083 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 195 (C-183)[1340], 25th August 1983; & JP-A-58 96 824 (NIPPON KOKAN K.K.) 09-06-1983, & JP5896824 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 98 (C-221)[1535], 9th May 1984; & JP-A-59 13 031 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU K.K.) 23-01-1984, & JP5913031 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 134 (C-285)[1857], 8th June 1985; & JP-A-60 21 333 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU K.K.) 02-02-1985, & JP6021333 A 00000000 |