EP0234206 - Hand tool for opening glass ampoules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Hackner Prototypen GmbH Wappersdorf Nr. 35 D-8431 Mühlhausen / DE | [1987/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackner, Wilhelmine, geb.Ring Wangen 21 D-8431 Mühlhausen / DE | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Fauststrasse 30 D-85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100236.6 | 10.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | DE19863606017 | 25.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3606017 | [1987/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234206 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234206 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/08, C03B33/12 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
C03B33/14 (EP);
B67B7/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Handgerät zum Öffnen von Glasampullen | [1987/36] | English: | Hand tool for opening glass ampoules | [1987/36] | French: | Outil à main pour ouvrir des ampoules en verre | [1987/36] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/47] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1129309 ; | [A]US2631411 ; | [A]US2566434 ; | [AD]DE1491744 ; | [AD]US2507187 ; | [AD]FR1572461 ; | [AD]DE3132041 |