EP0229669 - Integrated wire/surface guidance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Industrial Automation Systems, Inc. 280 East Riley Street Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states Litton Industrial Automation Systems, Inc. 280 East Riley Street Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultz, Warner J. 1893 Pinecroft S.W. Wyoming Michigan 49509 / US | 02 /
Young, Ernest L. 2241 Glen Echo S.E. Grand Rapids Michigan 49506 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/30] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100456.0 | 15.01.1987 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | US19860820551 | 17.01.1986 Original published format: US 820551 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229669 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229669 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/022, B21D7/12 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
G05D1/0234 (EP);
G05D1/0242 (EP);
G05D1/0265 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | G05D1/03, B62D1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Führungssystem mit eingebettetem Draht oder eingebetteter Oberfläche | [1987/30] | English: | Integrated wire/surface guidance system | [1987/30] | French: | Système de guidage par fil ou surface intégrés | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LU, NL | 01.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/04] | 28.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.12.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59148909 ; | [A]JPH0631620 ; | [A]JPH0695614 ; | [A]US3598196 (BALLANTYNE THOMAS J, et al); | [AD]EP0012554 (BELL & HOWELL CO [US]); | [A]GB2129161 (INDUSTRY THE SECRETARY OF STAT) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 286 (P-324)[1723]27th December 1984; & JP-A-59 148 909 (DAIFUKU KIKO K.K.) 25-08-1984 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 156 (P-368)[1879]29th June 1985; & JP-A-6 031 620 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 18-02-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 243 (P-392)[1966]30th September 1985; & JP-A- 6 095 614 (KIYUUSHIYUU NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 29-05-1985 |