EP0231796 - Microwave oven timer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahon, Joseph John 818 Hayes Avenue Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100566.6 | 17.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | US19860826434 | 05.02.1986 Original published format: US 826434 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231796 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231796 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H43/10 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
H01H43/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Zeitschalter für Mikrowellenöfen | [1987/33] | English: | Microwave oven timer | [1987/33] | French: | Commutateur horaire pour four à micro-ondes | [1987/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/45] | 19.06.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0124202 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0092374 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]US4366352 (OBERMANN GEORGE); | [A]US4206337 (MARQUIS EDGAR E [US]); | [A]US4551590 (MAHON JOSEPH J [US]) |