EP0230973 - Method and apparatus for making a rope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerpenwerk GmbH Zweifaller Strasse 285 D-5190 Stolberg / DE | [1987/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Bertram, Ing.grad. Am Wiesenhof 11 D-5014 Kerpen-Buir / DE | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Langmaack, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 D-50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100759.7 | 21.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | DE19863601952 | 23.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3601952 | [1987/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230973 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230973 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D07B3/00 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
D07B3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Seiles und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1987/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for making a rope | [1987/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une corde | [1987/32] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE661597 ; | [X]GB2002834 ; | [X]GB1184611 |