EP0232758 - Compact electrophotographic printing apparatus having an improved developement means and a method for operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Sachio 72-4, Kizuku-Omachi, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 02 /
Wanou, Masahiro 30-1-201, Takaishi 4-chome Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 215 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Masatoshi 350-2, Nishi-Hassakucho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 227 / JP | 04 /
Nakajima, Junzo Kirigaoka-Greentown 1 Kirigaoka 4-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 227 / JP | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100783.7 | 21.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | JP19860026229 | 08.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2622986 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232758 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232758 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/24, G03G17/00, G03G15/09 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
G03G15/09 (EP);
G03G15/24 (EP);
G03G15/344 (EP);
G03G2215/0497 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/34] | Title | German: | Kompaktes elektrophotographisches Druckgerät mit verbesserten Entwicklungsmitteln und sein Durchführungsverfahren | [1987/34] | English: | Compact electrophotographic printing apparatus having an improved developement means and a method for operating the same | [1987/34] | French: | Appareil d'impression électrophotographique compact comprenant des moyens de développement et méthode pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59222861 ; | [AD]US4545669 (HAYS DAN A [US], et al); | [A]DE3245281 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4394671 (ERICKSON ROGER D); | [A]DE3245224 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4289837 (GUNDLACH ROBERT W) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 97 (P-352)[1820], 26th April 1985; & JP-A-59 222 861 (CANON K.K.) 14-12-1984, & JP59222861 A 00000000 |