EP0230988 - Process for the production of esters of 6-aminocaproic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hutmacher, Hans-Martin Rüdigerstrasse 70 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Broecker, Franz Josef, Dr. Schwanthaler Allee 20 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Merger, Franz, Dr. Max-Slevogt-Strasse 25 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Fischer, Rolf, Dr. Bergstrasse 98 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
Vagt, Uwe, Dr. Paul-Neumann-Strasse 44 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 06 /
Schneider, Heinz-Walter, Dr. Brüsseler Ring 43 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
Richter, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Hüttenwingert 16 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 08 /
Harder, Wolfgang, Dr. Bergwaldstrasse 16 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 09 /
Priester, Claus-Ulrich, Dr. Wiesenstrasse 18 D-6701 Meckenheim / DE | [1987/32] | Application number, filing date | 87100893.4 | 23.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | DE19863602378 | 28.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3602378 | [1987/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230988 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230988 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230988 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/00, C07C229/04 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
C07C227/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/32] | C07C99/00, C07C101/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 6-Aminocapronsäureestern | [1987/32] | English: | Process for the production of esters of 6-aminocaproic acid | [1987/32] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'esters et de l'acide 6-aminocaproique | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 31.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.1993
17.05.1993
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Postbox 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL Opponent's representative den Hartog, Jeroen H.J. DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.1993
17.05.1993
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Postbox 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL Opponent's representative den Hartog, Jeroen H.J. DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1993/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.1993
17.05.1993
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Postbox 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL Opponent's representative den Hartog, Jeroen H.J. Octrooiburaeu DSM, P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1993/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.1993
DSM N.V. Postbox 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | 21.05.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.07.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 02.11.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.10.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/42] | 11.10.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.11.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2777873 (HASEK ROBERT H); | [A]DE952442 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [A]DE2601461 (BASF AG); | [A]US2822377 (JAKOB KAISER WILHELM) | [A] - SYNTHETIC METHODS OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 21, 1967, Seiten 217-218, S. Karger Verlag, Basel, CH |