EP0230996 - Pressure-Controlled Intermittent Coronary Sinus Occlusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mohl, Werner, M.D. Endemanngasse 6-18/2/35 Flat 235 A-1238 Vienna / AT | For all designated states MANSFIELD SCIENTIFIC, INC. 135 Forbes Boulevard Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states Mohl, Werner, M.D. Endemanngasse 6-18/2/35 Flat 235 A-1238 Vienna / AT | ||
For all designated states MANSFIELD SCIENTIFIC, INC. 135 Forbes Boulevard Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohl, Werner Endemanngasse 6-18/2/35, App.235 A-1238 Wien / AT | 02 /
Tolkoff, Marc Joshua 39 Jordan Road Brookline, Massachusetts 02146 / US | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Heidrich, Udo European Patent Attorney, Apdo. 488 E - 38650 Los Christianos / Tenerife / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Heidrich, Udo, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys. Rechtsanwalt & Patentanwalt Dipl.-Phys. Dr. jur. U. HEIDRICH Franziskanerstrasse 30 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100942.9 | 26.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | US19860824721 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: US 824721 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230996 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230996 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230996 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M29/00 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/12109 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B5/02 (US);
A61M1/3613 (EP,US);
A61M60/143 (EP,US);
A61M60/268 (US);
A61M60/295 (EP);
A61M60/32 (EP);
A61M60/427 (US);
A61M60/497 (EP);
A61M60/531 (EP,US);
A61M60/554 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00154 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00703 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0003 (EP,US);
A61M2025/102 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1052 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3355 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2230/30 (EP,US);
A61M60/274 (US);
A61M60/833 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2230/30, A61M2230/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/32] | Title | German: | Intermittierender Verschluss des Coronar-Sinus durch Druckeinwirkung | [1987/32] | English: | Pressure-Controlled Intermittent Coronary Sinus Occlusion | [1987/32] | French: | Occlusion par pression intermittente du sinus coronaire | [1987/32] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/01: Teilanmeldung 90115824.6 eingereicht am 26/01/87 | EPB 1993/01: Divisional application 90115824.6 filed on 26/01/87 | EPB 1993/01: Demande divisionnaire 90115824.6 déposée le 26/01/87 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90115824.6 / EP0402964 | EP94105150.0 / EP0609914 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Request for further processing for: | 03.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4069815 [ ] (LEE ARNOLD S J); | US4299226 [ ] (BANKA VIDYA S); | FR2502499 [ ] (FARCOT JEAN CHRISTIAN [FR]); | EP0079086 [ ] (CORDIS EUROP [NL]); | US4456000 [ ] (SCHJELDAHL GILMORE T [US], et al); | US4601706 [ ] (AILLON RENE [US]) |