EP0229677 - Glow plugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WELLMAN THERMAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1 Progress Road Shelbyville Indiana 46176 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states WELLMAN THERMAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1 Progress Road Shelbyville Indiana 46176 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, Frank Taylor R.R.2, Box 450 Shelbyville Indiana 46176 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87101029.4 | 21.03.1984 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | US19830483365 | 08.04.1983 Original published format: US 483365 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229677 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229677 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F23Q7/00 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
F23Q7/001 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Glühkerze | [1987/30] | English: | Glow plugs | [1987/30] | French: | Bougie à incandescence | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/03] | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84301923.3 / EP0122075 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2006335 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AD]FR2415266 (BERU WERK RUPRECHT GMBH CO A [DE]); | [X]DE2927978 (BERU WERK RUPRECHT GMBH CO A) |