EP0233512 - Cyclohexene carboxylic esters and amides as antidysrhythmic agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toder, Bruce Harrison 18 Beacon Hill Rochester New York 14450 / US | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101040.1 | 26.01.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | US19860830592 | 18.02.1986 Original published format: US 830592 | [1987/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233512 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/14, C07C101/28, C07C103/19, C07C103/737, // A61K31/445, A61K31/16, A61K31/215 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
C07D295/155 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61P9/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Cyclohexancarbonsäureester und -amide, verwendbar als antidysrhythmische Mittel | [1987/35] | English: | Cyclohexene carboxylic esters and amides as antidysrhythmic agents | [1987/35] | French: | Esters et amides d'acides cyclohexènecarboxyliques à titre d'agents antidysrythmiques | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/42] | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2812331 [ ]; | US3530126 [ ] (BERNASCONI RAYMOND, et al); | US3974157 [ ] (SHETTY BOLA VITHAL, et al) |