EP0241649 - Capacitive position detector at an electromagnetic force-compensating balance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher CH-8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Peter Saumstrasse 28 CH-8625 Gossau / CH | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87101228.2 | 29.01.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | CH19860001493 | 15.04.1986 Original published format: CH 149386 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241649 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241649 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241649 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01G7/06, G01G7/04, G01G1/18, G01D5/24 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
G01G7/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/43] | G01G7/06, G01G7/04, G01G1/18, G01G23/00, G01B7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/43] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Positionsdetektor an einer elektromagnetisch kraftkompensierenden Waage | [1987/43] | English: | Capacitive position detector at an electromagnetic force-compensating balance | [1987/43] | French: | Détecteur capacitif de position sur une balance compensant électromagnétiquement les forces | [1987/43] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/31: (deleted) | EPB 1987/43: Ein Antrag nach Regel 88 EPü auf Berichtigung der Beschreibung liegt vor. Eine Entscheidung darüber wird von der Prüfungsabteilung getroffen werden | Examination procedure | 16.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 26.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3685604 (SMITH JAMES E, et al); | [A]DE3012979 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0039249 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3410955 (AVERY LTD W & T [GB]) |