EP0234321 - Mechanism to control the oscillations of the heald frame connecting rods in a rotary dobby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIMTESSILE FABBRICA ITALIANA MACCHINARIO TESSILE S.p.A. Via Spiazzi, 52 I-24028 Ponte Nossa (Bergamo) / IT | [1987/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serturini, Giuseppe Via Vezza d'Oglio 6 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Vatti, Paolo, et al Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101234.0 | 29.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | IT19860019248 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: IT 1924886 | [1987/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234321 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234321 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D03C1/00, F16D11/06 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
D03C1/00 (EP,US);
F16D11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Mechanismus für die Steuerung der Oszillationen von Kurbelstangen, die verbunden sind mit den Webschäften in einer Rotationsschaftmaschine | [1987/36] | English: | Mechanism to control the oscillations of the heald frame connecting rods in a rotary dobby | [1987/36] | French: | Mécanisme de commande des oscillations des bielles reliées aux lames dans une ratière rotative | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 03.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.1989 | GR | 08.11.1989 | NL | 08.11.1989 | SE | 08.11.1989 | LU | 31.01.1990 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
LU | 31.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/29] | NL | 08.11.1989 | |
SE | 08.11.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2001401 (SULZER AG); | [A]EP0050088 (VERDOL SA [FR]); | [A]EP0068139 (TEXTILMA AG [CH]); | [A]EP0079843 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR]); | [A]EP0080547 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]DE3222581 (MAYER FA KARL [DE]) |