EP0233554 - Arrangement for building up the withdrawal pressure in a water supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bomin Solar GmbH & Co KG Industriestrasse 8-10 D-7850 Lörrach-Haagen / DE | [1987/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaas, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Sehringer Strasse 1a D-7840 Müllheim 15 / DE | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101549.1 | 05.02.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | DE19863604056 | 08.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604056 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233554 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233554 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E03B5/02 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
E03B5/02 (EP);
F04B49/022 (EP);
F16K37/0033 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Aufbau des Entnahme-Druckes in einem Wasserversorgungssystem | [1987/35] | English: | Arrangement for building up the withdrawal pressure in a water supply system | [1987/35] | French: | Dispositif pour l'accumulation d'une pression à enregistrer d'eau dans un système de distribution | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/43] | 08.06.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4180374 ; | [A]GB2040406 ; | [A]DE2237470 ; | [A]US3865512 ; | [A]US4344741 |