EP0233564 - Device for eliminating hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | For:ES
GR
IT
LU
AT
Gesellschaft für Reaktorsicherheit (GRS) mbH Schwertnergasse 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | ||
For:ES
GR
IT
LU
AT
Gesellschaft für Reaktorsicherheit (GRS) mbH Schwertnergasse 1 D-50667 Köln / DE | |||
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klatt, Karl-Heinz Wendelinusstrasse 64 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Wenzl, Helmut, Prof.Dr. Nordstrasse 9 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 03 /
Chakraborty, Amiya K., Dr. Tannenweg 9a D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | [1990/26] |
Former [1987/35] | 01 /
Klatt, Karl-Heiz Wendelinusstrasse 64 D-5170 Jülich / DE | ||
02 /
Wenzl, Helmut, Prof.Dr. Nordstrasse 9 D-5170 Jülich / DE | |||
03 /
Chakraborty, Amiya K., Dr. Tannenweg 9a D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101717.4 | 07.02.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | DE19863604416 | 12.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604416 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233564 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233564 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233564 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
G21C19/317 (EP,US);
B01D53/00 (EP,US);
B01J12/007 (EP,US);
C01B3/508 (EP,US);
C01B3/583 (EP,US);
C01B5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Beseitigung von Wasserstoff | [1987/35] | English: | Device for eliminating hydrogen | [1987/35] | French: | Dispositif pour écarter l'hydrogène | [1987/35] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 01.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.06.1990 | IT | 27.06.1990 | ES | 08.10.1990 | AT | 07.02.1991 | LU | 28.02.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 27.06.1990 | |
IT | 27.06.1990 | ||
AT | 07.02.1991 | ||
LU | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1999/52] | IT | 27.06.1990 | |
AT | 07.02.1991 | ||
LU | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.06.1990 | |
AT | 07.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 07.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2451438 (DECATOX GMBH); | [A]DE2536798 (MORLOCK GUENTER DIPL PHYS); | [A]EP0015428 (HILL EUGENE FARRELL); | [A]US4422859 (MCGEE WILLIAM R [US]) |