EP0232912 - Hydroxamic acids of 7-oxabicycloheptane substituted ethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varma, Ravi Kannadikovilakom 293 Deer Run Drive Belle Mead, N.J. / US | 02 /
Das, Jagabandhu 47 Joni Avenue Hamilton Square, N.J. / US | [1992/20] |
Former [1987/34] | 01 /
Kannadikovilakom Varma, Ravi 293 Deer Run Drive Belle Mead New Jersey / US | ||
02 /
Das, Jagabandhu 47 Joni Avenue Hamilton Square New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101942.8 | 12.02.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860829257 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: US 829257 | US19860829639 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: US 829639 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232912 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232912 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/08, A61K31/34 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
C07D493/08 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Hydroxamsäure von 7-oxabicycloheptan substituierten Äthern | [1987/34] | English: | Hydroxamic acids of 7-oxabicycloheptane substituted ethers | [1987/34] | French: | Acides hydroxamiques dérivés d'éthers substitués par oxa-7 bicycloheptane | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4607049 [ ] (HALL STEVEN E [US]); | US4555523 [ ] (HALL STEVEN E [US], et al); | US4550120 [ ] (DAS JAGABANDHU [US], et al) |