EP0236785 - Process for the production of trihydroxy-benzenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1990 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prescher, Günter, Dr. Liesingstrasse 2 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Ritter, Gebhard, Dr. Lucasweg 1 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Sauerstein, Holger Goethestrasse 1 D-6451 Grosskrotzenburg / DE | [1987/38] | Application number, filing date | 87102100.2 | 14.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | DE19863607924 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3607924 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236785 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236785 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/10, C07C37/60 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C07C37/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/60, C07C39/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Trihydroxybenzolen | [1987/38] | English: | Process for the production of trihydroxy-benzenes | [1987/38] | French: | Procédé de préparation de trihydroxybenzènes | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2138735 [ ] (HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH); | US3959388 [ ] (DE HEIJ NICOLAAS A, et al); | US4387252 [ ] (JUPE CHRISTOPH [DE], et al); | EP0122374 [ ] (DEGUSSA [DE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C Feld, Band 4, Nr. 106, 30. Juli 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 149 C 20 * JP - A - 55-69 529 ( KOGYO GIJUTSUIN ) * |