EP0238839 - Wound covering having a high absorption capacity, based on a polysaccharide as the carrier of a non-immobilized enzyme with a therapeutic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm Pharma GmbH Dr.-Otto-Röhm-Strasse 2-4 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Röhm Pharma GmbH Dr.-Otto-Röhm-Strasse 2-4 D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petereit, Hans-Ulrich Lortzingstrasse 22 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Zeiss, Gerhard, Dr. Sudetenstrasse 12 c D-6080 Gross-Gerau / DE | [1987/40] | Application number, filing date | 87102219.0 | 17.02.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | DE19863606265 | 27.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3606265 | [1987/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238839 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238839 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/03 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,US);
A61L15/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Wundauflage auf Polysaccharidbasis als Träger therapeutisch wirksamer, nicht-immobilisierter Enzyme und mit hoher Saugfähigkeit | [1987/40] | English: | Wound covering having a high absorption capacity, based on a polysaccharide as the carrier of a non-immobilized enzyme with a therapeutic activity | [1987/40] | French: | Pansement pour blessure à capacité d'absorption élevée à base de polysaccharide comme support d'enzyme non immobilisée à activité thérapeutique | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2203827 (AVICON INC [US]); | [A]US4226232 (SPENCE WAYMAN R); | [A]DE3035037 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]); | [A]FR2552667 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED [CS]) |