EP0241672 - Process for preparing thermoplastically processable aromatic polyamides and polyamidimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finke, Jürgen Dr. Am Alten Sportplatz 17a D-4370 Marl / DE | 02 /
Bartmann, Martin Dr. Burgstrasse 35 D-4350 Recklinghausen / DE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87102249.7 | 17.02.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863612935 | 17.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612935 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241672 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241672 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/14, C08G69/42, C08G69/32 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
C08G69/32 (EP,US);
C08G69/42 (EP,US);
C08G73/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung thermoplastisch verarbeitbarer aromatischer Polyamide und Polyamidimide | [1987/43] | English: | Process for preparing thermoplastically processable aromatic polyamides and polyamidimides | [1987/43] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polyamides et polyamidimides aromatiques thermoplastiques | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 07.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.1992 | BE | 28.02.1992 | [1994/18] |
Former [1993/13] | BE | 28.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1601964 ; | [A]DE2226951 (ICI LTD); | [AD]US4348513 (KESKE ROBERT G, et al); | [AD]US4358561 (KESKE ROBERT G, et al); | [AD]US4447574 (KESKE ROBERT G [US], et al) |