EP0241673 - Brake control adjuster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinecke, Erich, Dipl.-Ing. Kastanieneck 6 D-3167 Burgdorf / DE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1993/20] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1987/43] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102252.1 | 17.02.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863611941 | 09.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611941 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241673 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241673 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0241673 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60T15/14, B60T13/66 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T13/66 (EP,US);
Y10S303/03 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20528 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Bremswertgeber | [1987/43] | English: | Brake control adjuster | [1987/43] | French: | Ajusteur de commande de frein | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 18.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.1990
04.04.1990
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.1990
04.04.1990
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | 01.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.03.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.04.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.04.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.09.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1961039 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE2839291 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [AD]DE2937657 (WABCO FAHRZEUGBREMSEN GMBH); | [AP]EP0190411 | by applicant | DE1961039 | DE2937657 |