EP0234519 - Front assembly for a cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Zenith Center 1000 Milwaukee Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-2493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Zenith Center 1000 Milwaukee Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-2493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fendley, James R. 211 W. Pickwick Arlington Heights Illinois 60005 / US | 02 /
Dougherty, Lawrence W. 1220 Timber Drive Sleepy Hollow Illinois 60118 / US | 03 /
Strauss, Paul 336 Wellington - Apt. 2005 Chicago Illinois 60657 / US | 04 /
Kaplan, Sam H. 7141 N. Kedzie Chicago Illinois 60645 / US | 05 /
Dietch, Leonard 4500 Greenwood Skokie Illinois 60076 / US | 06 /
Jarosz, John 5002 Estes Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102413.9 | 20.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | US19860832493 | 21.02.1986 Original published format: US 832493 | US19860832556 | 21.02.1986 Original published format: US 832556 | US19860831699 | 21.02.1986 Original published format: US 831699 | US19860835845 | 03.03.1986 Original published format: US 835845 | US19860866030 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: US 866030 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234519 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234519 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234519 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/07, H01J29/86 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
H01J9/2271 (EP);
H01J29/07 (KR);
H01J29/073 (EP);
H01J2229/0716 (EP);
H01J2229/0722 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/36] | Title | German: | Vorderteil für Kathodenstrahlröhre | [1987/36] | English: | Front assembly for a cathode ray tube | [1987/36] | French: | Ensemble frontal pour tube à rayons cathodiques | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Request for further processing for: | 01.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.07.1995 | IT | 05.07.1995 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.07.1995 | |
IT | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 05.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3894321 (MOORE JOHN H); | [A]EP0121628 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [A]EP0143938 (ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) | by applicant | US2625734 | US2842696 | US2905845 | US3284655 | US3303536 | US3727087 | US3894321 | US4045701 | US4069567 | JPS56141148 | US4547696 |