EP0234553 - Process of laminating fotofoils on circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkenschlager, Hans-Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Spielfeldstrasse 15 D-8900 Augsburg 21 / DE | [1987/36] | Application number, filing date | 87102586.2 | 24.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | DE19863606225 | 26.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3606225 | [1987/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234553 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234553 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, G03F7/02, G03F7/16 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G03F7/11 (EP);
G03F7/161 (EP);
H05K3/0079 (EP);
H05K2203/0577 (EP);
H05K2203/0759 (EP);
H05K3/064 (EP);
H05K3/108 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auflaminieren von Fotofolien auf Leiterplatten | [1987/36] | English: | Process of laminating fotofoils on circuit boards | [1987/36] | French: | Procédé de laminage de feuilles photosensibles sur des substrats pour circuits | [1987/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/09] | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4557996 | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 15, Nr. 2, Juli 1972, Seite 654, New York, US; P. BAKOS et al.: "Undercoat to prevent underplating in electrolytic processing" |