EP0237025 - Light-sensitive microcapsule containing polymerizable compound and silver halide, and light-sensitive material employing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakimi, Fujio No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103419.5 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860053873 | 10.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5387386 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237025 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237025 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237025 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/06, G03C1/72 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G03F7/0285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/38] | G03F7/02, G03C1/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/38] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Mikrokapsel, die Silberhalogenid und eine polymerisierbare Verbindung enthält und lichtempfindliches Material, das diese gebraucht | [1987/38] | English: | Light-sensitive microcapsule containing polymerizable compound and silver halide, and light-sensitive material employing the same | [1987/38] | French: | Microcapsule sensible à la lumière contenant de l'halogénure d'argent et un composé polymérisable et matériau sensible à la lumière l'utilisant | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.10.1993 | [1994/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0046415 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE3226608 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0139479 (MEAD CORP [US]); | [XPD]EP0174634 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |