EP0237028 - N-(phenyl) or n-(phenylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4, (substituted phenyl) amino-3-furancarboxamide derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vassil, Stenatov Georgiev 3248 Winton Road, SO No. K-32 Rochster New York 14620 / US | 02 /
Mack, Robert Allan 817 Elmwood Terrace Rochster New York 14620 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103431.0 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | US19860839298 | 13.03.1986 Original published format: US 839298 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237028 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/68, // A61K31/365 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | N-(Phenyl)- oder N-(Phenylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4 (substituiertes phenyl)amino -3-furan-carboxamid-Derivate | [2007/46] | English: | N-(phenyl) or n-(phenylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4, (substituted phenyl) amino-3-furancarboxamide derivatives | [1987/38] | French: | Dérivés de N-(phényl) ou N-(phénylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4 (phényl substitué)amino -3-furannecarboxamide | [2007/46] |
Former [1987/38] | N-(Phenyl)- oder N-(Phenylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4[(substituiertes phenyl)amino]-3-furan-carboxamid-Derivate | ||
Former [1987/38] | Dérivés de N-(phényl) ou N-(phénylcyclopropyl)-2,5-dihydro-2-oxo-4[(phényl substitué)amino]-3-furannecarboxamide | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 10.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/50] | 21.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4625040 (GEORGIEV VASSIL S [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 1, 8th July 1974, page 266, abstract no. 3306n, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. SONE et al.: "Reactions of 1,1-bismethylthio-2-nitroethylene. IV. Syntheses and reactions of 4-methylthio-2-buten-4-olide derivatives", & CHEM. PHARM. BULL. 1974, 22(3),617-622 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 52, no. 3, 6th February 1987, pages 477,478, American Chemical Society, Easton, PA., US; R.A. MACK et al.: "A novel 3(2H)-furanone-2(5H)-furanone rearrangement" |