EP0237053 - One piece non-cementitious anchorable and biocompatible acetabular cup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Chemnitz Strasse der Nationen 62 09111 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Technische Universität Chemnitz Postfach 964 O-9010 Chemnitz / DE | ||
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states Technische Universität Chemnitz Postfach 964 O-9010 Chemnitz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurze, Peter, Dr.sc.nat. Hauptstrasse 48 DDR-9109 Oberlichtenau / DD | 02 /
Rabending, Klaus, Dr.rer.nat. Arthur-Beil-Strasse 44 DDR-9115 Taura / DD | 03 /
Krysmann, Waldemar, Dr. rer.nat. Fritz-Schmenkel-Strasse 39 DDR-9071 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DD | 04 /
Daniel, Peter, Dr. Sc.med. Leipziger Strasse 175 DDR-9081 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DD | 05 /
Wehner, Wilfried, OMR Prof.Dr.sc.Med. Max-Planck-Strasse 46b DDR-9081 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DD | 06 /
Polster, Manfred Kirchhoffstrasse 27 DDR-9030 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DD | 07 /
Morgenstern, Rainer, Dr.med. Enzmannstrasse 15 DDR-9005 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DD | [1988/12] |
Former [1987/38] | 01 /
Kurze, Peter, Dr.sc.nat. Hauptstrasse 48 DDR-9109 Oberlichtenau / DE | ||
02 /
Rabending, Klaus, Dr.rer.nat. Arthur-Beil-Strasse 44 DDR-9115 Taura / DE | |||
03 /
Krysmann, Waldemar, Dr. rer.nat. Fritz-Schmenkel-Strasse 39 DDR-9071 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DE | |||
04 /
Daniel, Peter, Dr. Sc.med. Leipziger Strasse 175 DDR-9081 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DE | |||
05 /
Wehner, Wilfried, OMR Prof.Dr.sc.Med. Max-Planck-Strasse 46b DDR-9081 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DE | |||
06 /
Polster, Manfred Kirchhoffstrasse 27 DDR-9030 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DE | |||
07 /
Morgenstern, Rainer, Dr.med. Enzmannstrasse 15 DDR-9005 Karl-Marx-Stadt / DE | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried, et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr., et al Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103530.9 | 11.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | DD20010002878 | 12.03.1986 Original published format: DD 287801 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237053 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237053 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237053 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34, A61L27/00 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30929 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30934 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30968 (EP,US);
A61F2002/343 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3432 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3446 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00131 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00616 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1987/38] | A61F2/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Einteilige zementfrei verankerbare biokompatible Hüftgelenkpfanne | [1987/38] | English: | One piece non-cementitious anchorable and biocompatible acetabular cup | [1987/38] | French: | Cupule cotyloidienne d'une seule pièce, biocompatible pour ancrage sans ciment | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 20.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2310322 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]FR2548661 (SUMITOMO CEMENT CO [JP]); | [Y]DE3446048 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [YE]EP0211676 |