EP0269781 - Device for determining mass flow and the flow direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1988/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weibler, Wolfgang, Dr. Vor der Heide 14 D-6238 Hofheim a. T. / DE | 02 /
Wolfgang, Porth Röhrborngasse 70 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103661.2 | 13.03.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863637541 | 04.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3637541 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269781 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01P13/02, G01P5/12, G01F1/68, G01P13/00 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
G01F1/684 (EP,US);
F02D41/187 (EP,US);
G01F1/6888 (EP,US);
G01F1/696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Massenstromes und der Durchflussrichtung | [1988/23] | English: | Device for determining mass flow and the flow direction | [1988/23] | French: | Dispositif pour la détermination du débit massique et de la direction du débit | [1988/23] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/38] | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5786058 ; | [X]GB1488012 (HAWKER SIDDELEY DYNAMICS ENG); | [Y]EP0035680 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [Y]US3995481 (DJORUP ROBERT S); | [Y]DE2423302 (OUTOKUMPU OY) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 168 (P-139)[1046], 2. September 1982; & JP-A-57 86 058 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 28-05-1982, & JP5786058 A 00000000 |