EP0238950 - Flat textile article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norddeutsche Faserwerke GmbH Tungendorfer Strasse 10 24536 Neumünster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Norddeutsche Faserwerke GmbH Tungendorfer Strasse 10 D-24536 Neumünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erren, Karl-Heinz Wiesengrund 2 D-2356 Aukrug-Homfeld / DE | 02 /
Höppner, Frank Plöner Strasse 78 D-2350 Neumünster / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Karin Dorfstrasse 3 D-2214 Lohbarbek / DE | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1987/40] | Lindner, Wolfgang, Dr. Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse D-45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103667.9 | 13.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | DE19863610381 | 27.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3610381 | [1987/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238950 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238950 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/16 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
D04B21/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Flächiges Textilgut | [1987/40] | English: | Flat textile article | [1987/40] | French: | Article textile plat | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 31.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2404479 ; | [Y]FR2267408 ; | [Y]US4487040 | [Y] - SYNTHETISCHE FASERN AUS POLYAMIDEN, Akademie-Verlag, 1963, Berlin |