EP0238013 - Paint resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumada, Hajime 7-25, Ebisu-cho Kishiwada-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Shoji, Akio 2-20-10, Tenjinyama-cho Kishiwada-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103765.1 | 16.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | JP19860057108 | 17.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5710886 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238013 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238013 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/80, C08G18/62, C08G18/63 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/791 (EP,US);
C08G18/6229 (EP,US);
C08G18/635 (EP,US);
C08G18/8012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/39] | Title | German: | Lackharzzusammensetzung | [1987/39] | English: | Paint resin composition | [1987/39] | French: | Composition de résine de peinture | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3248372 (WILHELM BUNGE); | [A]FR2366330 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0103146 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0155559 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]); | [YP]EP0175344 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) |