EP0241730 - Propulsion device, especially for shallow draught watercraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schottel-Werft Josef Becker GmbH & Co KG. D-56322 Spay / DE | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krautkremer, Franz, Dipl.-Kaufmann Im Mühren 41 D-5401 Spay/Rhein / DE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Walter, Helmut Aubinger Strasse 81 81243 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Walter, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Aubinger Strasse 81 D-81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103778.4 | 16.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863609032 | 18.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3609032 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241730 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241730 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B63H25/46 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
B63H11/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | Antriebseinrichtung für insbesondere flachgehende Wasserfahrzeuge | [1991/37] | English: | Propulsion device, especially for shallow draught watercraft | [1987/43] | French: | Dispositif de propulsion, notamment pour des bateaux à faible tirant d'eau | [1987/43] |
Former [1987/43] | Artriebseinrichtung für insbesondere flachgehende Wasserfahrzeuge | Examination procedure | 21.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 07.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE423687 (GILL PROPELLER COMPANY LTD); | [A]US2112948 (FRANCIS ANDERSON ALBERT); | [Y]GB2071592 (SCHOTTEL WERFT) |