EP0243662 - Method and device for testing cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 D-2810 Verden / DE | 02 /
Liedtke, Kurt Trift 18 D-2810 Verden / DE | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1987/45] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104156.2 | 20.03.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | DE19863613090 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613090 | [1987/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243662 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243662 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243662 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/30 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
B65B19/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Zigaretten | [1987/45] | English: | Method and device for testing cigarettes | [1987/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de cigarettes | [1987/45] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/14: (deleted) | EPB 1987/45: Ein Antrag gemäss Regel 88 EPÜ auf Hinzufügung der fehlende Seite 4 in die Beschreibung liegt vor. | Examination procedure | 11.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3993217 (DAVIES ROBERT WILLIAM, et al); | [A]EP0086107 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]) |