EP0240814 - A working fluid for traction drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minokami, Tomiyasu No. 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsubouchi, Toshiyuki No. 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Hata, Hitoshi 15-6, 3-ch., Fukuohdai Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104193.5 | 21.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | JP19860082363 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8236386 | JP19860090168 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: JP 9016886 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240814 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240814 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240814 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C10M111/00, C10M127/00, // (C10M111/00, 105:02), C10N40:04 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C10M127/00 (EP,US);
C10M105/06 (KR);
C10M105/02 (EP,US);
C10M111/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/02 (EP,US);
C10M2203/0206 (EP,US);
C10M2203/022 (EP,US);
C10M2203/024 (EP,US);
C10M2203/04 (EP,US);
C10M2203/06 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/28 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2229/04 (EP,US);
C10M2229/043 (EP,US);
C10M2229/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/046 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Betriebsflüssigkeit für Traktionsgetriebe | [1987/42] | English: | A working fluid for traction drive | [1987/42] | French: | Fluide de transmission pour entraînement par traction | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 30.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0164038 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [A]DE3337503 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) |