EP0240833 - Monitoring apparatus for monitoring the operation mode of transmission devices of the information transmission technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.04.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drügh, Paul, Dipl.-Phys. Stockmannstrasse 28 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Stiftsbogen 14 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1987/42] | Application number, filing date | 87104333.7 | 24.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863612275 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612275 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240833 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240833 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/46 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
H04B3/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Überwachungsvorrichtung zur Überwachung des Betriebzustandes von Übertragungseinrichtungen der Nachrichtenübertragungstechnik | [1987/42] | English: | Monitoring apparatus for monitoring the operation mode of transmission devices of the information transmission technique | [1987/42] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance pour la surveillance du fonctionnement de dispositifs de transmission de la technique de transmission d'informations | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1992
04.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Vermögensverwaltung Werner und Manfred Vierling Postfach 11 65 D-91316 Ebermannstadt / DE | [1992/32] | 29.06.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.07.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.12.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.01.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.01.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.09.1991 | NL | 11.09.1991 | ES | 22.12.1991 | BE | 31.03.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 11.09.1991 | |
NL | 11.09.1991 | ||
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1997/17] | NL | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1997/16] | NL | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | NL | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/15] | NL | 11.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5943639 ; | [A]JP5590160 ; | [Y]WO8403359 (ZOTTNIK EDMUND); | [A]EP0156753 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 131 (E-251)[1568], 19. Juni 1984; & JP-A-59 43 639 (CHIYUUBU DENRIYOKU K.K.) 10-03-1984, & JP5943639 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 137 (E-27)[619], 25. September 1980; & JP-A-55 90 160 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 08-07-1980, & JP5590160 A 00000000 |