EP0241773 - Determination of register differences in multi-colour printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipphan, Helmut, Dr. Bibiena-Strasse 6 D-6830 Schwetzingen / DE | 02 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Ott, Hans Ostering 54 D-8105 Regensdorf / DE | 04 /
Graf, Jean Pierre, Dr. Via Selva 4 CH-6900 Massango / CH | [1991/22] |
Former [1987/43] | 01 /
Kipphan, Helmut, Dr. Bibiena-strasse 6 D-6830 Schwetzingen / DE | ||
02 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
Ott, Hans Ostering 54 D-8105 Regensdorf / DE | |||
04 /
Graf, Jean Pierre, Dr. Via Selva 4 CH-6900 Massango / CH | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104372.5 | 25.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | CH19860001567 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: CH 156786 | CH19860002392 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: CH 239286 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241773 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241773 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F13/02 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
B41F13/025 (EP,US);
B41F33/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Bestimmung des Registerfehlers beim Mehrfarbendruck | [1987/43] | English: | Determination of register differences in multi-colour printing | [1987/43] | French: | Détermination des défauts de repérage dans l'impression polychrome | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 03.02.1990 | Appeal received | 26.03.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.1990 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2051065 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2848963 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG); | [A]DE2940233 (WERNER GERHARD); | [A]EP0177885 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) |