EP0241774 - Surgical closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, K. Li 305 Barlow Road Fairfield Connecticut 06430 / US | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104411.1 | 25.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | US19860851761 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: US 851761 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241774 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241774 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Chirurgische Verschliessvorrichtung | [1987/43] | English: | Surgical closure device | [1987/43] | French: | Dispositif chirurgical de fermeture | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 03.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/11] | 02.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 02.04.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0130037 [ ] (ETHICON INC [US]); | FR2322578 [ ] (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]); | FR2416912 [ ] (ETHICON INC [US]) |