EP0277262 - A parallel data processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The President of the Agency of Industrial Science and Technology No. 1-3-1, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states The President of the Agency of Industrial Science and Technology No. 1-3-1, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Hiroyuki MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION No. 5-1-1, Oofuna Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger & Partner Postfach 16 55 D-82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104550.6 | 27.03.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | JP19870023555 | 05.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2355587 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277262 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277262 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
G06F15/8023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/32] | G06F15/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Ein paralleler Datenprozessor | [1988/32] | English: | A parallel data processor | [1988/32] | French: | Un processeur parallèle de données | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4304002 (HUNT DAVID J); | [A]US4314349 (BATCHER KENNETH E); | [A]US4380046 (FROSCH ROBERT A ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [A]DE3500040 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-18, no. 2, April 1983, pages 147-156, IEEE, New York, US; T. KONDO et al.: "An LSI adaptive array processor" |