EP0240905 - Process for the preparation of impact-resistant poly(alkyl) styrene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bronstert, Klaus, Dr. Gartenstrasse 26 6719 Carlsberg / DE | 02 /
Hoenl, Hans, Dr. Hauptstrasse 69 a 6719 Obersuelzen / DE | 03 /
Echte, Adolf, Dr. Leuschnerstrasse 42 6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Klaerner, Peter, Dr. Hauptstrasse 62 6719 Battenberg / DE | [1987/42] | Application number, filing date | 87104730.4 | 31.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863611705 | 08.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611705 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240905 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240905 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F279/02, C08F285/00, // (C08F279/02, 212:06) | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F279/02, C08F212/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schlagfestem Poly(alkyl)styrol | [1987/42] | English: | Process for the preparation of impact-resistant poly(alkyl) styrene | [1987/42] | French: | Préparation de poly(alkyl)styrène résistant au choc | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2813328 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]DE3409656 (BASF AG [DE]) |